+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ330ER)
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House with amendments (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Del. Orrock agreed to
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Taken up
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- VOTE: WAIVE READING R (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 053374784-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ330E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 053374784
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2005: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2005: Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: WAIVE READING R (38-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2005: VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor