+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ330ER)
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 13102554D
+ − Votes (4)
February 15, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2013: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2013: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor