+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ325ER)
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On January 14, 1999 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 996026685
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor