+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ323ER)
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Appointments
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
- Assigned to P&E sub: Certificate, Oath and Confirmation
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100582D
+ − Votes (6)
January 29, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2013: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2013: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2013: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2013: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor