+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ319ER)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 19104362D
+ − Votes (5)
February 4, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2019: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2019: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2019: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2019: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor