+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passage requires majority of members, not less than 21
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read second time
- Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO (19-Y 19-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Reading waived
- Rejected by Senate (20-Y 18-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO (20-Y 18-N)
- Passage requires majority of members, not less than 21
- Rec. of defeat. action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Rejected by Senate (19-Y 19-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 992485713-E
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendment (8-Y 2-N 5-A)
On January 13, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 992485713
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: AGREE TO (20-Y 18-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: AGREE TO (19-Y 19-N)
February 5, 1999: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: Reported from P. & E. with amendment (8-Y 2-N 5-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor