+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ317ER)
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Title replaced
- Printed as engrossed 970123828-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On January 29, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote
On January 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 970123828
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1997: Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1997: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1997: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor