+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ312ER)
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Taken up
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Reading waived
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/06/03 033131464
+ − Votes (4)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2003: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor