+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Left in Privileges and Elections
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments Subcommittee
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate (34-Y 6-N)
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 1-N)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100182D