+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ301ER)
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/09/13 13103289D
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor