+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ297ER)
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 17, 2003 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On January 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Printed as engrossed 033581524-E
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 033581524
- Prefiled; 12/19/02 033581524
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor