+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ290ER)
On February 12, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (24-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 997095713-E
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/11/99 997095713
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 12, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 10, 1999: Reported from Privileges and Elections (24-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1999: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: Reported from P. & E. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor