+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 20, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ29ER)
On February 19, 2002 in the House:
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from M., P. & P. S. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Placed on Calendar
On January 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 020833518-E
On January 23, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/19/01 020833518
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 19, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2002: Reported from M., P. & P. S. (22-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2002: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor