+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On March 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SR29ER)
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 971870666-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 971870666-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 971870666-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 31, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 970404666
+ − Vote
February 19, 1997: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor