+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 50-N)
- Motion to rerefer to committee rejected (46-Y 51-N)
- Rejected by House (48-Y 50-N)
- Motion to refer to committee rejected (38-Y 59-N)
- VOTE: REFERRAL TO P & E COMMITTEE (38-Y 59-N)
- Motion for pending question rejected
- VOTE: REFERRAL TO RULES COMMITTEE (46-Y 51-N)
- Floor amendment agreed to (Woodrum)
- Floor amendment rejected (Wilkins) (47-Y 49-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (47-Y 49-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (5-Y 4-N)
On February 9, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 8, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. LD4472605-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to LD4472605-S1
- VOTE: PASSAGE (22-Y 18-N)
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with substitute (10-Y 5-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD4472605-S1
On January 18, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed LD3567701
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
February 22, 1995: VOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 50-N)
February 22, 1995: VOTE: REFERRAL TO P & E COMMITTEE (38-Y 59-N)
February 22, 1995: VOTE: REFERRAL TO RULES COMMITTEE (46-Y 51-N)
February 22, 1995: VOTE: REJECTED (47-Y 49-N)
February 16, 1995: Reported from Rules (5-Y 4-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (22-Y 18-N)
February 1, 1995: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1995: Reported from P. & E. with substitute (10-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor