+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ28ER)
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 22, 2010 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 10100290D
On January 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/13/10 10100290D