+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ276ER)
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- House amendments agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House with amds. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Floor amendment agreed to (Reynolds)
- Committee amendments agreed to
On February 14, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (10-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 8, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to LD3021665-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. LD3021665-S1
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD3021665-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute
On January 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed LD5589665