+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ275ER)
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 060624820
On March 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 060624820
+ − Vote
March 9, 2006: VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor