+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ269ER)
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
On January 24, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 23, 1997 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On January 16, 1997 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 975939749
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor