+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ269ER)
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 065878788
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 065878788
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor