+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ266ER)
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 065845804
On February 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 065845804
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor