+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ260ER)
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On March 1, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Printed as engrossed 028390452-E
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On February 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 028390452
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor