+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ258ER)
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- House amendments agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House with amds. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
On February 14, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (10-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 25, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On January 24, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (37-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On January 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted LD1164753
On January 11, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed LD1164753