+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ257ER)
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N)
- Agreed to by House (94-Y 1-N)
- Taken up
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 1-N)
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Privileges and Elections
- Motion to recommit to committee agreed to
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100045D
+ − Votes (7)
February 13, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N)
February 12, 2015: Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 1-N)
February 11, 2015: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2015: Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2015: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2015: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2015: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor