+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ254ER)
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (73-Y 26-N 1-A)
- Taken up
- VOTE: ADOPTION (73-Y 26-N 1-A)
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 6-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ254E
- Printed as engrossed 19100620D-E
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On October 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100620D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 20, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (73-Y 26-N 1-A)
February 18, 2019: Reported from Rules (10-Y 6-N)
February 5, 2019: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor