+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ25ER)
On February 25, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 11-N)
- Agreed to by House (84-Y 11-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (9-Y 1-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On January 31, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On January 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (11-Y 3-N)
On January 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed