+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ25ER)
On January 26, 1996 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
On January 19, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On January 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 969808000
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor