+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ248ER)
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 064650744
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor