+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ248ER)
On February 25, 2002 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Printed as engrossed 028349444-E
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On February 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk 028349444
- Received