+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ244ER)
On March 7, 2008 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 089246284
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 089246284
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor