+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in Rules (17-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 001189500-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 001189500-S1
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 001189500-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 004910500
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2000: Passed by indefinitely in Rules (17-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor