+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ236ER)
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 12105786D
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 12105786D