+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled in Rules by voice vote
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ236S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104448D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15104448D-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100946D
+ − Vote
January 29, 2015: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor