+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ234ER)
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 23, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Title replaced
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 973474760-E
On January 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On January 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 973474760
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
January 22, 1997: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor