+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ234ER)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (96-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (24-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 986640803-E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to in part by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO IN PART R (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to(p.1,line 16 & 17)by Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- VOTE: AGREE TO IN PART R (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Communicated to House
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendment (11-Y 0-N 1-A)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Motion to recommit to committee agreed to
- Recommitted to Privileges and Elections
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 986640803
- VOTE: CONSENT TO INTRODUCE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Consent to introduce (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
March 12, 1998: Reported from Privileges and Elections (24-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: AGREE TO IN PART R (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: AGREE TO IN PART R (39-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: Reported from P. & E. with amendment (11-Y 0-N 1-A)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONSENT TO INTRODUCE R (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor