+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ234ER)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 10105604D
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 10105604D
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor