+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ233ER)
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 985768747
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Consent to introduce (38-Y 0-N)
+ − Vote
February 13, 1998: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor