+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ232ER)
On March 12, 2004 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On March 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On March 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 044440772
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 044440772