+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (14-Y 7-N)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N)
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate (33-Y 7-N)
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104950D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator Hanger agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SJ231ES1
- Printed as engrossed 17104950D-ES1
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P&E sub: Constitutional Amendments
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100989D