+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ227ER)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 23, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 977658693