+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ226ER)
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 069675792
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 069675792
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor