+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ224ER)
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- Taken up for immediate consideration
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Substitute by Sen. Houck agreed to 006755444-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Taken up
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. 006755444-S1
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Taken up
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Taken up
On February 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Taken up
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 006429444