+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Letter to Commonwealth Competition Council
- Passed by in Rules (17-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 001163432-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 001163432-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 001163432-S1
On February 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 000968432
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2000: Passed by in Rules (17-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2000: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor