+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rejected by Senate (17-Y 22-N)
- Read third time
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ217S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104050D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15104050D-S1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
On November 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101120D