+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ216ER)
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 084880250
On February 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 084880250
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor