+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ216ER)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Laid on Speaker's table
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Sponsors (102)
Type:
Primary Sponsor