+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ211ER)
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On February 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 985737758
- VOTE: CONSENT TO INTRODUCE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Consent to introduce (39-Y 0-N)