+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ206ER)
On March 12, 2004 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On March 5, 2004 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 044401772
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor