+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ201ER)
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 084872250
On February 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 084872250