+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ201ER)
On March 5, 2010 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 10104352D
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 10104352D